Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF LIVERPOOL CATHEDRAL

Charity number: 1122672
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 20 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 20 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 21 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 21 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 12 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 17 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 17 April 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2017 09 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required