Q2 REGENERATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1121495
Charity reporting is overdue by 1773 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014
Total gross income £33.32k £11.15k £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £33.56k £14.10k £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A