Financial history ALLSORTS YOUTH PROJECT LIMITED

Charity number: 1123014
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £336.61k £379.34k £490.44k £509.24k £600.67k
Total expenditure £316.89k £329.45k £470.90k £459.64k £515.70k
Income from government contracts N/A £83.71k £172.14k N/A £38.87k
Income from government grants £159.55k £15.84k N/A £287.40k £134.32k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £20.29k £39.38k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £49.90k £62.95k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £421.92k £8
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £243 £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £16.89k £498.34k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £459.64k £512.27k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 £3.44k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0