Trustees ALLSORTS YOUTH PROJECT LIMITED
Charity number: 1123014

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sally Hill | Chair | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
MOHAN RASANAYAGAM | Trustee | 31 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Viccars | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Cara Larkin | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Keil Morris | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Roberta Rampazzo | Trustee | 19 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ruby Ellen Moore | Trustee | 19 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Egan | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Matthew Thomas | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Danielle Plowman | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.