AFRICA ORPHANAGE FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of financial hardship and sickness, the advancement of education and the preservation of good health amongst children living in Africa. particularly but not exclusively orphaned, abandoned disabled and HIV/Aids children and young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 25 October 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Uganda
Governance
- 25 October 2007: Standard registration
- AFRICA ORPHANAGE FOUNDATION LIM ITED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARTIN BUTTERWORTH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANNETTE GRACE BUTTERWORTH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 25/10/2019 | 25/10/2020 | 25/10/2021 | 25/10/2022 | 25/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £480 | £460 | £218 | £200 | £200 | |
|
Total expenditure | £400 | £400 | £100 | £150 | £150 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 25 October 2023 | 12 September 2024 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 25 October 2022 | 12 September 2024 | 384 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 25 October 2021 | 30 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 25 October 2020 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 25 October 2019 | 24 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 25 JULY 2007 AS AMENDED 10 OCTOBER 2007
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND SICKNESS, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE PRESERVATION OF GOOD HEALTH AMONGST CHILDREN LIVING IN AFRICA, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY ORPHANED, ABANDONED AND DISABLED CHILDREN, IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THEIR CARE, EDUCATION AND HEALTH.
Area of benefit
AFRICA
Contact information
- Address:
-
148 WOODHOUSE ROAD
WAKEFIELD
WF1 4RD
- Phone:
- 01924363878
- Email:
- afrophafound@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window