THE FRIENDS OF SAINT STEPHEN ON THE CLIFFS BLACKPOOL

Charity number: 1120454
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £23.24k £22.06k £230.72k £24.30k £15.30k
Total expenditure £24.33k £22.47k £180.32k £74.12k £31.30k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A