THE DORFMAN FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1120714
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 29 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 29 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 04 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

04 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 01 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 01 February 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 05 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 05 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2016 03 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 03 February 2017 On time Download