COLNE OPEN DOOR CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1121144
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 19 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 19 August 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 26 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 04 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 04 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 13 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 13 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 12 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

12 October 2017 On time Download