Financial history UNION OF OLD ST MONICANS (UK)

Charity number: 1122118
Charity reporting is overdue by 36 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £3.62k £1.99k £2.59k £2.88k £3.39k
Total expenditure £3.29k £828 £1.11k £1.72k £1.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A