Accounts and annual returns THE ST GEORGE'S HANOVER SQUARE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1120505
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 30 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 23 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 23 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window