Financial history THE ST GEORGE'S HANOVER SQUARE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1120505
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £58.22k £88.12k £227.99k £67.21k £49.05k
Total expenditure £59.03k £62.55k £63.34k £61.77k £63.70k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A