Accounts and annual returns NATIONS LIGHT MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1121392
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 08 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 06 January 2021 341 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 02 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2017 28 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Not Required