FAITH AND HEALTH PROMOTION ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1121700
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 17 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2019 14 June 2020 106 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2018 27 June 2019 119 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2017 18 June 2019 475 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2016 29 April 2018 425 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 Not Required