THE WARRIOR PROGRAMME

Charity number: 1120893
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £395.58k £528.43k £644.05k £785.22k £758.76k
Total expenditure £394.33k £487.95k £561.17k £687.43k £607.43k
Income from government contracts £52.62k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £115.21k £388.50k £471.11k £400.12k £562.39k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £527.59k £643.75k £782.25k £750.74k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £849 £296 £2.98k £8.03k
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £463.10k £531.26k £660.30k £572.22k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £24.84k £29.91k £27.13k £35.21k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £7.00k £20.20k £35.41k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0