EATON MILL PRIMARY SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1120986
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2015 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019
Total gross income £53.08k £73.69k £69.74k £69.69k £66.34k
Total expenditure £37.05k £71.28k £63.35k £58.81k £56.64k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A