ABIGAIL HOUSING

Charity number: 1120729
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 11 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 11 June 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 21 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 06 November 2019 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 06 November 2019 6 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 25 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 25 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 21 November 2017 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 21 November 2017 21 days late Download