ABIGAIL HOUSING

Charity number: 1120729
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jo Gibson Trustee 25 April 2018 None on record
Daniel Howitt Trustee 06 April 2017 None on record
Ruth Anne Cooke Trustee 10 April 2020 None on record
Karim Mohamed Aref Trustee 11 January 2021 None on record
Tom Hall Trustee 21 April 2015 None on record
Teresa Jackson Trustee 04 November 2019
SAFETY FIRST COMMUNITY TRAINING CENTRE LIMITED Received: On time