CARE NETWORK CAMBRIDGESHIRE

Charity number: 1120693
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £941.82k £921.40k £1.01m £1.02m £1.10m
Total expenditure £887.43k £930.55k £969.74k £1.00m £944.81k
Income from government contracts £315.08k £316.19k £320.04k £322.64k £323.95k
Income from government grants £175.20k £219.12k £179.50k £186.25k £134.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £5.54k £6.55k £2.38k £29.13k £31.90k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £935.54k £914.40k £1.00m £982.32k £1.06m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £739 £455 £845 £1.77k £2.03k
Income - Other £0 £0 £1.49k £9.12k £4.02k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £887.43k £930.55k £969.74k £1.00m £914.81k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £30.00k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £4.58k £4.86k £6.22k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0