Accounts and annual returns HIGHFLY

Charity number: 1126448
Charity reporting is overdue by 142 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 142 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 142 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 29 June 2023 149 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 March 2022 49 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 April 2021 65 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required