Financial history HIGHFLY

Charity number: 1126448
Charity reporting is overdue by 142 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £1.50k £1.00k £10.52k £0 £1.10k
Total expenditure £1.50k £1.00k £10.21k £0 £72
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A