NDORO CHILDREN'S CHARITIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide opportunity to as many children as possible in underprivileged Africa by focusing on the development of education, health promotion initiatives and social service in areas where other agencies have not yet ventured and by working in collaboration with other agencies in the UK. We are currently working to provide an orphanage home, school and clinic for children in Zimbabwe. Your donatio
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Islington
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 27 September 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROSELINE CHITEPO NDORO | Chair |
|
|
|||||
GLADYS BOTCHWAY | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Ronald Ndoro | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.47k | £4.31k | £4.49k | £3.11k | £4.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £216 | £216 | £2.81k | £954 | £3.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 10 September 2024 | 72 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 10 September 2024 | 438 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 19 July 2021 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 APRIL 2007.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF UNDERPRIVILEGED CHILDREN IN THIRD WORLD COUNTRIES SUCH AS ZIMBABWE, SOUTH AFRICA, BOTSWANA, ZAMBIA, NAMIBIA ETC. TO PROMOTE AWARENESS IN THESE CHILDREN AND THE PUBLIC ON THE CAUSES OF POVERTY, DISEASES, UNEMPLOYMENT AND HOMELESSNESS. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN SELF-RELIANCE AND PREVENTION OF DISEASES SUCH AS AIDS, MALNUTRITION, POVERTY AND UNEMPLOYMENT.
Area of benefit
ZIMBABWE, SOUTH AFRICA, BOTSWANA, ZAMBIA, NAMIBIA (NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS).
Contact information
- Address:
-
48 SIXTH CROSS ROAD
TWICKENHAM
TW2 5PD
- Phone:
- 02089434597
- Email:
- rose.n@ndorocc.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window