Financial history SOLIHULL SCHOOL

Charity number: 1120597
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £12.80m £13.60m £14.79m £24.25m £20.51m
Total expenditure £12.79m £14.68m £14.06m £18.24m £19.89m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £413.40k £147.80k
Income - Donations and legacies £89.63k £135.18k £460.93k £965.92k £218.74k
Income - Other trading activities £755.74k £842.71k £951.74k £1.23m £721.71k
Income - Charitable activities £10.62m £11.23m £11.99m £14.64m £18.45m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £460.93k £215.92k £0
Income - Investment £1.18m £1.39m £1.39m £1.22m £1.12m
Income - Other £150.30k £0 £0 £6.19m £0
Income - Legacies £1.41k £4 £0 £750.00k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £12.57m £13.09m £13.85m £18.06m £19.71m
Expenditure - Raising funds £221.39k £221.70k £203.28k £185.03k £178.45k
Expenditure - Governance £75.72k £61.64k £251.29k £211.89k £145.59k
Expenditure - Grants institution £3.31k £3.44k £3 £825 £925
Expenditure - Investment management £128.71k £221.70k £203.28k £185.03k £130.63k
Expenditure - Other £0 £1.36m £0 £0 £0