REVELATION CHURCH - LONDON

Charity number: 1120790
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £289.52k £435.65k £400.60k £417.68k £459.00k
Total expenditure £247.35k £342.70k £343.80k £388.98k £447.51k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A