REVELATION CHURCH - LONDON

Charity number: 1120790
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rebecca Lydia Joy Rundell Trustee 13 December 2015 None on record
Douglas Robert Hogg Trustee 14 April 2021 None on record
Kerry Lisa Baines Trustee 11 November 2020 None on record
David James Mance Trustee 01 April 2021 None on record
Malcolm Anthony Kyte Trustee 02 March 2021 None on record