ST MARY'S SOUTH BADDESLEY CHURCH TRUST

Charity number: 1120561
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 14 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 10 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 15 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 07 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 19 May 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required