Accounts and annual returns THE DAVID AND CLAUDIA HARDING FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1120878
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 01 November 2021 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 01 November 2021 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 08 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 08 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 01 November 2019 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 01 November 2019 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 17 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 17 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 22 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 22 September 2017 On time Download Open in new window