LA FRATERNITE GUINEENNE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
La Fraternite Guineenne your trusted charity: Relief of poverty, Education, community development, employment, Famine Relief, integration, advice, Training..
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Guinea
Governance
- 27 April 2010: Standard registration
- 09 September 2014: Removed (Does not operate)
- 24 September 2014: Re-registered
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MAMA SYLLA | Chair |
|
|
|||||
MAMADOU SAIDOU BAH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DIENABOU KANTE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.20k | £41.71k | £10.52k | £3.49k | £618 | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.05k | £37.05k | £12.90k | £5.91k | £540 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 March 2024 | 33 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 February 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 JANUARY 2007 AS AMENDED 10 APRIL 2010
Charitable objects
A) PROMOTING AND ENSURING THE BENEFIT/INTERESTS OF GUINEANS LIVING IN THE UK BY: I. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING INCLUDING ASSISTANCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT; II. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS; III. THE PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH; AND IV. THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; B) ADVANCING EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ON ALL ASPECTS OF GUINEAN HISTORY AND CULTURE.
Area of benefit
THE UK
Contact information
- Address:
-
215 DEPTFORD HIGH STREET ,
LONDON
London
SE8 3NT
- Phone:
- 07908154363
- Email:
- change@lafg.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window