Accounts and annual returns FOREST FARM PEACE GARDEN

Charity number: 1123031
Charity reporting is overdue by 54 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2023 Overdue Overdue by 54 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Overdue Overdue by 54 days
Annual return 30 June 2022 26 March 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 26 March 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 29 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 29 March 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 09 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 09 February 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2019 30 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 30 March 2020 On time Download Open in new window