GLOBAL MINISTRY OF CHAMPIONS

Charity number: 1121346
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £20.89k £26.08k £36.57k £24.00k £26.73k
Total expenditure £19.37k £27.80k £26.49k £34.50k £35.76k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A