THE MARGARET CROPPER TRUST

Charity number: 1122234
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £2.84k £2.12k £1.79k £2.12k £1.52k
Total expenditure £2.94k £2.94k £1.38k £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A