OLDHAM ATHLETIC COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1120894
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 04 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 04 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 25 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 25 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 17 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 17 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 05 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

( These accounts
have been qualified)

05 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 08 August 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 08 August 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)