OLDHAM ATHLETIC COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1120894
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jonathan Richard Belfield Trustee 30 July 2020 None on record
Karl Evans Trustee 15 December 2020 None on record
Neil Stewart Consterdine Trustee 05 October 2016 None on record
Tracy Ann Wood Trustee 05 October 2016 None on record
Tansy Louise Jones Trustee 30 July 2020 None on record
Daniel Inglis Trustee 27 March 2018 None on record
Phillip Jeffery Royales Chair 05 October 2020 None on record
Helen Murphy Trustee 02 June 2017 None on record