THE CANTOR CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THIS IS A SMALL FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST. WE DONATE MONEY TO THE CHARITY EACH YEAR TO GIVE TO CHOSEN CHARITIES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 06 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cheshire East
- Manchester City
Governance
- 31 August 2007: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR RIC CANTOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANGELA CHRISTINE KAYE CANTOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GEOFFREY SEFTON CANTOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EDWARD CANTOR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 06/04/2020 | 06/04/2021 | 06/04/2022 | 06/04/2023 | 06/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.00k | £2.00k | £3.00k | £1.45k | £3.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.03k | £1.74k | £1.84k | £3.26k | £3.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 06 April 2024 | 19 March 2025 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 April 2023 | 24 July 2024 | 169 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 April 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 April 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 April 2020 | 18 March 2021 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 15 FEBRUARY 2007
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO PAY OR APPLY SUCH INCOME AND THE WHOLE OR ANY PART OF THE TRUST FUND AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL THINK FIT TO OR FOR THE CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF SUCH BODIES ASSOCIATIONS OR ORGANISATIONS AS SHALL AT THE DATE OF PAYMENT OR APPLICATION TO BE ESTABLISHED FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES ONLY ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES (SUCH BODIES ASSOCIATIONS OR ORGANISATIONS BEING HEREINAFTER DEFINED AS THE 'CHARITIES') AND WHOSE PRINCIPAL OBJECTS SHALL BE:- (1) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND HARDSHIP OF PERSONS LIVING IN ENGLAND AND WALES; (2) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND HARDSHIP OF MEMBERS OF THE JEWISH FAITH LIVING IN ISRAEL; (3) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE JEWISH RELIGION THROUGH JEWISH EDUCATION TO PAY OR APPLY THE SAME TO OR FOR THE CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF SUCH OTHER CHARITIES OR TO PAY OR APPLY THE SAME FOR SUCH OTHER OBJECTS AS SHALL BE CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES (SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND SUCH OBJECTS BEING HEREINAFTER DEFINED AS THE 'OBJECTS') AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT UPON SUCH CONDITIONS (IF ANY) AND IN SUCH MANNER IN ALL RESPECTS AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT PROVIDED ALWAYS THAT NOTHING HEREAFTER IN THIS DEED SHALL AUTHORISE ANY PAYMENT OR APPLICATION OF ANY PART OF THE CAPITAL OR INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND TO OR FOR ANY PURPOSE OR OBJECTS NOT BEING EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
ENGLAND, WALES, ISREAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 2
Westfield
St. Margarets Road
Altrincham
WA14 2AW
- Phone:
- 01619298535
- Email:
- ANGELACANTOR@ME.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window