THE BOAZ TRUST HAMPSHIRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1121699
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £159.51k £148.31k £212.93k £215.52k £212.89k
Total expenditure £143.78k £154.46k £187.11k £183.45k £183.87k
Income from government contracts £62.00k £59.68k £75.69k £104.75k £97.25k
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A