Financial history WASPS COMMUNITY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1120904
Charity reporting is overdue by 394 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £391.88k £660.58k £854.10k £67.81k £1.55k
Total expenditure £392.46k £660.58k £822.80k £63.28k £2.34k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £162.91k £0 N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £165.85k £96.59k N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A £331.82k £757.51k N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £109.11k £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £660.58k £822.80k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A