SOURCE OF LIFE CHURCH IN FELLOWSHIP WITH ASSEMBLIES OF GOD

Charity number: 1120959
Charity reporting is up to date (32 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £6.07k £5.49k £5.65k £7.00k £12.19k
Total expenditure £5.99k £5.94k £5.08k £6.17k £11.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A