Trustees CATHAYS AND CENTRAL YOUTH AND COMMUNITY PROJECT

Charity number: 1122532
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ieuan Bater Chair 08 November 2021
THE WELSH ASSOCIATION OF YOUTH CLUBS
Received: 1 day late
Khalid Awad-Khan Trustee 02 November 2023
None on record
Dr Rhiannon McNamara Trustee 12 September 2023
None on record
ALI AHMED Trustee 16 May 2023
BANGLADESH UK ENVIRONMENTAL FOUNDATION
Overdue by 597 days
Bethan Williams Trustee 17 December 2022
None on record
Simon Murray Trustee 19 July 2022
None on record
Isobel Sweet Trustee 18 September 2019
None on record