Financial history BRITISH JOURNAL OF ANAESTHESIA

Charity number: 1121817
Charity reporting is up to date (42 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £2.32m £1.64m £1.94m £1.74m £1.85m
Total expenditure £2.47m £1.41m £1.62m £793.19k £1.13m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £138.38k £291 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.73m £1.01m £1.10m £1.19m £1.27m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £593.14k £625.08k £707.14k £547.34k £580.77k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £138.38k £291 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.43m £1.36m £1.56m £742.49k £1.07m
Expenditure - Raising funds £42.46k £49.50k £51.61k £50.70k £59.17k
Expenditure - Governance £82.20k £67.10k £78.31k £71.02k £118.69k
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.05m £881.83k £870.46k £264.33k £605.29k
Expenditure - Investment management £42.46k £49.50k £51.61k £50.70k £59.17k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0