THE LIVING ENVIRONMENT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activity of the company concerns the environmental management of neglected inner city sites as a means of delivering a range of associated education and community engagement programmes. The Trust also operates a narrow boat providing experiences to a variety of community groups and operations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Solihull
- Walsall
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 11 January 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
COLETTE JAYNE BOND | Trustee | 01 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW JAMES WALSTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL NOEL BREED | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.53k | £6.74k | £6.08k | £6.21k | £6.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 February 2024 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 February 2023 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22 DECEMBER 2006, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 5 DECEMBER 2007.
Charitable objects
I) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT; II) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CONSERVATION PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT; III) TO PROVIDE OPPORTUNITIES FOR MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC INCLUDING YOUNG PERSONS AND DISADVANTAGES INDIVIDUALS AND COMMUNITY GROUPS TO BENEFIT FROM TRAINING OR RE-TRAINING IN AND FROM HAVING THE PRACTICAL EXPERIENCE OF INVOLVEMENT IN PROJECTS INTENDED TO BENEFIT THE CONSERVATION OF AND THE PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT; IV) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR IN AREAS OF PERCEIVED ENVIRONMENTAL, SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION TO OWN LEASE PROVIDE PROTECT MAINTAIN OR MANAGE ANY LAND OR ANY RIVER STREAM POND OR OTHER WATER FEATURE (TOGETHER "WATER FEATURES") AND/OR ANY OTHER FACILITIES INTENDED TO FURTHER THE CONSERVATION PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT; AND V) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO SEEK OUT AND TO DEVELOP OPPORTUNITIES TO PROCURE IMPROVEMENT TO THE INTERRELATIONSHIP BETWEEN AND TO ENHANCE THE C0-EXISTENCE OF THE BUILT AND THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENTS AND IN PARTICULAR TO SEEK OUT AND TO DEVELOP OPPORTUNITIES TO IMPROVE AND/OR RESTORE AREAS OF LAND AND/OR WATER FEATURES WHICH ARE OR HAVE BEEN NEGLECTED OR ARE OTHERWISE IN NEED OF RESTORATION AND/OR IMPROVEMENT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, WEST MIDLANDS AND WARWICKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Alan Higgs Centre
Allard Way
Coventry
CV3 1JP
- Phone:
- 024 7630 8244
- Email:
- pnbreed@cvlife.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window