THE SUNSHINE FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are trying to support charitable organisations which give support to needy children in Africa and the Caribbean. We have so far identified one charity that we can immediately support and this is the Besoro Child Foundation in Ghana. At the moment we raise funds from items like clothing and bric-a-brac which are donated to us. We also support orphanage in Romania.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Croydon
Governance
- 15 January 2008: Standard registration
- 15 July 2014: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2008 | 30/09/2009 | 30/09/2010 | 30/09/2011 | 30/09/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.45k | £22.61k | £27.69k | £36.43k | £35.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.58k | £18.52k | £26.82k | £30.68k | £37.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2012 | 27 November 2013 | 120 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2012 | 04 December 2013 | 127 days late | |
Annual return | 30 September 2011 | 09 January 2013 | 163 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2011 | 04 December 2013 | 492 days late | |
Annual return | 30 September 2010 | 06 August 2011 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2010 | 05 December 2011 | 128 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 16 DECEMBER 2007
Charitable objects
1) TO RELIEVE THE NEED OF POOR CHILDREN IN AFRICA AND THE CARIBBEAN. 2) TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONGST THOSE SEEKING ASYLUM AND THOSE GRANTED REFUGEE STATUS IN THE UK, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE FROM DARFUR, WESTERN SUDAN, PARTICULARLY BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND SUPPORT SERVICES.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window