THE FRIENDS OF PRINCESS MARGARET HOSPITAL (JAMAICA) UNITED KINGDOM

Charity number: 1122417
Charity reporting is overdue by 719 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 353 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 353 days
Annual return 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 719 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 719 days
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 17 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 05 February 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required