THE FRIENDS OF PRINCESS MARGARET HOSPITAL (JAMAICA) UNITED KINGDOM

Charity number: 1122417
Charity reporting is overdue by 686 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017
Total gross income £4.42k £4.79k £6.38k £7.46k £2.00k
Total expenditure £2.22k £2.46k £3.47k £4.62k £1.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A