CENTRE FOR THEOLOGY AND COMMUNITY LIMITED

Charity number: 1121648
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £394.08k £373.18k £277.85k £312.43k £352.77k
Total expenditure £428.12k £372.94k £275.63k £307.45k £352.03k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A