ELECTRIC STORM YOUTH LIMITED

Charity number: 1121106
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 24 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 24 August 2021 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 24 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 24 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 23 March 2020 47 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 23 March 2020 47 days late Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 30 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 04 February 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 18 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 18 January 2018 On time Download