GREAT WESTERN AIR AMBULANCE CHARITY

Charity number: 1121300
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £3.73m £4.32m £4.16m £3.72m £4.14m
Total expenditure £2.78m £3.18m £3.31m £3.66m £3.64m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £728.50k £1.00m £21.88k £17.38k £531.30k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.95m £2.46m £2.37m £1.75m £1.99m
Income - Other trading activities £1.77m £1.83m £1.79m £1.96m £2.12m
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £6.34k £11.02k £23.34k
Income - Other £12.89k £25.55k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £170.10k £188.85k £85.31k £696.63k £349.88k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.06m £2.04m £2.14m £2.30m £2.28m
Expenditure - Raising funds £713.99k £1.13m £1.18m £1.37m £1.36m
Expenditure - Governance £45.55k £0 £70.22k £76.90k £81.34k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £9.69k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0