KNIGHTSBRIDGE SCHOOL EDUCATION FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1120970
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 24 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 24 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 16 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 16 March 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 24 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 07 October 2019 160 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 28 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 28 March 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 31 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 04 April 2017 On time Download