KNIGHTSBRIDGE SCHOOL EDUCATION FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1120970
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Claudia Nahrath Trustee 04 April 2019 None on record
Matthew Jordan Trustee 10 February 2014 None on record
Christiane Elsenbach Trustee 28 May 2015 None on record
Caroline Cartellieri Karlsen Trustee 18 June 2018
Asthma UK and British Lung Foundation Partnership Received: On time
Dominic Clive Trustee 19 June 2019 None on record
VALENTINA PAN Chair 01 January 2019 None on record