Governance UNIVERSITY JEWISH CHAPLAINCY
Charity number: 1126031
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
- 23 September 2008: Standard registration
- 17 April 2013: Funds received from 261324 UNIVERSITY JEWISH CHAPLAINCY BOARD
- 07 April 2022: Funds received from 234038 ACHIEZER
- 15 February 2024: Funds received from 511139 MIDLAND REGION CHAPLAINCY BOARD
- 12 April 2024: Funds received from 1122425 ENSIX CHARITABLE TRUST
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
No other names
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.