CHELSEA OPEN AIR NURSERY SCHOOL AND CHILDRENS CENTRE

Charity number: 1122191
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £5.15k £5.26k £5.24k £3.26k £6.58k
Total expenditure £6.70k £5.14k £8.33k £6.82k £5.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A