Financial history THE LATA FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1123580
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £38.58k £76.68k £123.05k £39.41k £42.27k
Total expenditure £49.02k £60.65k £59.30k £71.39k £67.36k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A